Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Stefano (Ildefonso) Ortiz Cortes, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Mottola (Motula), Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Jan 1725Born
30 Jun 174823.4Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
2 Jun 176641.3AppointedBishop of Mottola (Motula), Italy
8 Jun 176641.3Ordained BishopBishop of Mottola (Motula), Italy
Mar 1791³66.0DiedBishop of Mottola (Motula), Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Stefano (Ildefonso) Ortiz Cortes
Bishop Stefano (Ildefonso) Ortiz Cortes O.S.B. (born , died Mar 1791) Bishop of Mottola (Motula)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNapoli

  • a priest for 42.6 years
  • a bishop for 24.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1775
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 297
  • c34: CB, 12 May 2013
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1766, Number 16

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast