Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luigi Antonio Valdina Cremona

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Hermopolis Maior


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Oct 1687BornVenezia
24 Oct 171730.0Ordained DeaconDeacon
31 Oct 171730.0Ordained PriestPriest
23 Mar 172941.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Hermopolis Maior
3 Apr 172941.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Hermopolis Maior
24 Oct 175871.0DiedTitular Bishop of Hermopolis Maior

MicroData Summary for Luigi Antonio Valdina Cremona:
Bishop Luigi Antonio Valdina Cremona (born , died ) Titular Bishop of Hermopolis Maior

  • a priest for 40.9 years
  • a bishop for 29.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 219
  • ob/c2: AT, 24 May 2015
  • b/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 223, Number 18,452

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 22 Aug 2015