Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joannes Calcagnini

Deceased

Bishop of Fondi (Fundi)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 May 1717³BornCaietan
22 Sep 174225.4Ordained PriestPriest
9 Apr 176446.9AppointedBishop of Fondi (Fundi), Italy
15 Apr 176446.9Ordained BishopBishop of Fondi (Fundi), Italy
24 Dec 177558.6DiedBishop of Fondi (Fundi), Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Joannes Calcagnini:
Bishop Joannes Calcagnini (born , died ) Bishop of Fondi (Fundi)

  • a priest for 33.3 years
  • a bishop for 11.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 221

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013