Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Donato Antonio Giannelli

Deceased

Bishop of Bisceglie


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Jan 1718BornCaiazzo
9 Mar 174325.1Ordained PriestPriest
22 Nov 176244.8AppointedBishop of Bisceglie, Italy
28 Nov 176244.8Ordained BishopBishop of Bisceglie, Italy
1791¹72.9DiedBishop of Bisceglie, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Donato Antonio Giannelli:
Bishop Donato Antonio Giannelli (born , died 1791) Bishop of Bisceglie

  • a priest for 47.8 years
  • a bishop for 28.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1762
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 442
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1762, Number 24

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 28 Nov 2015