Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Agnellus Broya

Deceased

Bishop of Teano


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Apr 1712BornNapoli
22 Sep 173624.4Ordained PriestPriest
17 Nov 175543.6AppointedBishop of Teano, Italy
23 Nov 175543.6Ordained BishopBishop of Teano, Italy
Nov 1767³55.5DiedBishop of Teano, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Agnellus Broya:
Bishop Agnellus Broya (born , died Nov 1767) Bishop of Teano

  • a priest for 31.1 years
  • a bishop for 11.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 399
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1755, Number 38

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 17 Nov 2015