Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Giuseppe Cardinal Simonetti

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of San Marcello


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Sep 1709BornCastelnuovo di Farfa, Italy
26 Mar 173525.5Ordained PriestPriest
25 May 176151.6AppointedTitular Archbishop of Petra in Palaestina
7 Jun 176151.7Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Petra in Palaestina
26 Sep 176657.0Elevated to Cardinal
1 Dec 176657.1InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Marcello
4 Jan 176757.2DiedCardinal-Priest of San Marcello

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Simonetti:
Giuseppe Cardinal Simonetti (born , died ) Cardinal-Priest of San Marcello

  • a priest for 31.7 years
  • a bishop for 5.5 years
  • a cardinal for .2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 26 Sep 1766

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015