Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Onofrio de Rossi

Deceased

Bishop of Sant’Agata de’ Goti


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Aug 1717BornAversa
17 Dec 174023.3Ordained PriestPriest
26 Sep 175740.0AppointedBishop of Fondi (Fundi), Italy
2 Oct 175740.1Ordained BishopBishop of Fondi (Fundi), Italy
9 Apr 176446.6AppointedBishop of Ischia, Italy
17 Jul 177557.9AppointedBishop of Sant’Agata de’ Goti, Italy
2 Nov 178467.2DiedBishop of Sant’Agata de’ Goti, Italy

MicroData Summary for Onofrio de Rossi:
Bishop Onofrio de Rossi (born , died ) Bishop of Sant’Agata de’ Goti

  • a priest for 43.8 years
  • a bishop for 27.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1764
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1775
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 69, and Page 221
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 246

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015