Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Castellini

Deceased

Bishop of Rimini, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Mar 1707Born
4 Apr 174437.0Ordained PriestPriest
13 Mar 175850.9AppointedBishop of Tivoli, Italy
26 Mar 175851.0Ordained BishopBishop of Tivoli, Italy
19 Dec 176356.7AppointedBishop of Rimini, Italy
10 May 177770.1DiedBishop of Rimini, Italy

MicroData Summary for Francesco Castellini
Bishop Francesco Castellini (born , died ) Bishop of Rimini

EventPlace
Birth PlaceForlž, Diocese of Forli

  • a priest for 33.0 years
  • a bishop for 19.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 100, and Page 407
  • c34: CB, 13 May 2013
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations …piscopales, Year 1,758, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast