Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Honuphrius del Tufo

Deceased

Bishop of Guardialfiera (Guardia)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Mar 1703BornNapoli
6 Apr 172623.0Ordained PriestPriest
24 May 175653.2AppointedBishop of Guardialfiera (Guardia), Italy
27 May 175653.2Ordained BishopBishop of Guardialfiera (Guardia), Italy
28 Jul 177572.3DiedBishop of Guardialfiera (Guardia), Italy

MicroData Summary for Honuphrius del Tufo:
Bishop Honuphrius del Tufo (born , died ) Bishop of Guardialfiera (Guardia)

  • a priest for 49.3 years
  • a bishop for 19.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 231
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1756, Number 12

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 18 Nov 2015