Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Franciscus Xaverius Romanelli

Deceased

Bishop of Lavello


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Sep 1726BornBitonto
10 Apr 175124.5Ordained PriestPriest
5 Aug 176538.8AppointedBishop of Lavello, Italy
11 Aug 176538.9Ordained BishopBishop of Lavello, Italy
18 Sep 177549.0DiedBishop of Lavello, Italy

MicroData Summary for Franciscus Xaverius Romanelli:
Bishop Franciscus Xaverius Romanelli (born , died ) Bishop of Lavello

  • a priest for 24.4 years
  • a bishop for 10.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 256
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1765, Number 20

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 7 Dec 2015