Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Francesco Maria della Torre

Deceased

Bishop of Albenga, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Jan 1717Born
25 Feb 174124.1Ordained PriestPriest
11 May 176447.3AppointedBishop of Albenga, Italy
20 May 176447.3Ordained BishopBishop of Albenga, Italy
9 Feb 177962.0DiedBishop of Albenga, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Francesco Maria della Torre
Bishop Giuseppe Francesco Maria della Torre (born , died ) Bishop of Albenga

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGenova

  • a priest for 37.9 years
  • a bishop for 14.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1775
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 74
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1764, Number 15

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast