Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Battista Minucci, O.F.M. Conv. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Policastro


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Jul 1680BornCivita Reale
1741²60.4AppointedMinister General of Order of Friars Minor Conventual
15 May 174766.7AppointedBishop of Policastro, Italy
23 May 174766.8Ordained BishopBishop of Policastro, Italy
20 Nov 176181.3ResignedBishop of Policastro, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Battista Minucci:
Bishop Giovanni Battista Minucci O.F.M. Conv. (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Policastro

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 343
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1747, Number 8

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015