Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Nicola Filomarini (Filomarino), O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Caserta


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Dec 1725³BornNapoli
22 Dec 174823.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
1 May 176337.4SelectedArchbishop of Acerenza e Matera, Italy
16 May 176337.4ConfirmedArchbishop of Acerenza e Matera, Italy
22 May 176337.4Ordained BishopArchbishop of Acerenza e Matera, Italy
24 Aug 176741.7SelectedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Caserta, Italy
31 Aug 176741.7ConfirmedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Caserta, Italy
4 Sep 178155.7DiedBishop of Caserta, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Nicola Filomarini (Filomarino):
Archbishop Nicola Filomarini (Filomarino) O.S.B. (born , died ) Bishop of Caserta

  • a priest for 32.7 years
  • a bishop for 18.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1775
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1763, Number 9
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 64, and Page 152

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 29 Nov 2015