Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Cesare Antonio Caracciolo, C.R. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Conza


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Jun 1713BornTaranto
1729¹15.5ProfessedMember of Congregation of Clerics Regular
10 Aug 173724.1Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of Clerics Regular
9 Dec 176552.4AppointedArchbishop of Conza, Italy
15 Dec 176552.4Ordained BishopArchbishop of Conza, Italy
27 Oct 177663.3DiedArchbishop of Conza, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Cesare Antonio Caracciolo:
Archbishop Cesare Antonio Caracciolo C.R. (born , died ) Archbishop of Conza

  • a priest for 39.2 years
  • a bishop for 10.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 177
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 134
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1765, Number 33

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 7 Dec 2015