Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovan Filippo Leonardo Vitetta

Deceased

Bishop of Castellaneta


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Apr 1703BornCiro
7 Jun 172724.1Ordained PriestPriest
20 Feb 176460.8AppointedBishop of Castellaneta, Italy
25 Feb 176460.8Ordained BishopBishop of Castellaneta, Italy
1778¹74.6DiedBishop of Castellaneta, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovan Filippo Leonardo Vitetta:
Bishop Giovan Filippo Leonardo Vitetta (born , died 1778) Bishop of Castellaneta

  • a priest for 50.5 years
  • a bishop for 13.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 153
  • c34: CB, 18 Jul 2014
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1764, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 29 Nov 2015