Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanbattista Caracciolo, C.R. †

Deceased

Bishop of Aversa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Dec 1695BornNapoli
1712¹16.0ProfessedMember of Congregation of Clerics Regular
17 Dec 171822.9Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of Clerics Regular
16 Feb 176165.1AppointedBishop of Aversa, Italy
22 Feb 176165.1Ordained BishopBishop of Aversa, Italy
6 Jan 176569.0DiedBishop of Aversa, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanbattista Caracciolo:
Bishop Giovanbattista Caracciolo C.R. (born , died ) Bishop of Aversa

  • a priest for 46.0 years
  • a bishop for 3.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1764
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 111
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 134
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1761, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 24 Nov 2015