Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Francesco Brancia

Deceased

Archbishop of Chieti


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Jan 1725BornNapoli
8 Jun 174823.3Ordained PriestPriest
9 Apr 176439.2AppointedArchbishop of Chieti, Italy
15 Apr 176439.2Ordained BishopArchbishop of Chieti, Italy
7 Jan 177044.9DiedArchbishop of Chieti, Italy

MicroData Summary for Francesco Brancia:
Archbishop Francesco Brancia (born , died ) Archbishop of Chieti

  • a priest for 21.5 years
  • a bishop for 5.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1764, Number 7
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 400

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 29 Nov 2015