Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Aluffi

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Bagnoregio (Bagnorea)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 May 1708³BornRieti
20 Apr 173728.9Ordained PriestPriest
11 May 176455.9AppointedBishop of Bagnoregio (Bagnorea), Italy
20 May 176455.9Ordained BishopBishop of Bagnoregio (Bagnorea), Italy
27 Feb 178980.7ResignedBishop of Bagnoregio (Bagnorea), Italy
1795¹86.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Bagnoregio (Bagnorea), Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Aluffi:
Bishop Giuseppe Aluffi (born , died 1795) Bishop Emeritus of Bagnoregio (Bagnorea)

  • a priest for 57.6 years
  • a bishop for 30.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 114
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1764, Number 17

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 28 Dec 2015