Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Maruca

Deceased

Bishop of Vieste


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Aug 1714BornAjello
1743¹28.3Ordained PriestPriest
20 Aug 176449.9AppointedBishop of Vieste, Italy
26 Aug 176449.9Ordained BishopBishop of Vieste, Italy
27 Dec 178470.3DiedBishop of Vieste, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Maruca:
Bishop Giuseppe Maruca (born , died ) Bishop of Vieste

  • a priest for 41.9 years
  • a bishop for 20.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1770
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 439
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1764, Number 33

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 29 Nov 2015