Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Giuseppe Maria Cardinal Capece Zurlo, C.R. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Napoli {Naples}

Cardinal-Priest of San Bernardo alle Terme


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Jan 1711BornMonteroni
6 Jan 172716.0ProfessedMember of Congregation of Clerics Regular
28 Feb 173322.1Ordained DeaconDeacon of Congregation of Clerics Regular
19 Dec 173322.9Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of Clerics Regular
24 May 175645.3AppointedBishop of Calvi Risorta, Italy
27 May 175645.3Ordained BishopBishop of Calvi Risorta, Italy
16 Dec 178271.9AppointedArchbishop of Napoli {Naples}, Italy
16 Dec 178271.9Elevated to Cardinal
17 Feb 178372.1InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Bernardo alle Terme
31 Dec 180190.9DiedArchbishop of Napoli {Naples}, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Maria Capece Zurlo:
Giuseppe Maria Cardinal Capece Zurlo C.R. (born , died ) Archbishop of Napoli {Naples}

  • a priest for 68.0 years
  • a bishop for 45.5 years
  • a cardinal for 19.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 16 Dec 1782
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1756, Number 13
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 141, and Page 304

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.1, 31 Dec 2015; Data: 16 Jan 2016