Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio De Cumis

Deceased

Bishop of Catanzaro, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Oct 1704Born
20 Sep 172722.9Ordained PriestPriest
24 Jan 176358.2AppointedBishop of Catanzaro, Italy
30 Jan 176358.2Ordained BishopBishop of Catanzaro, Italy
3 Sep 177873.8DiedBishop of Catanzaro, Italy

MicroData Summary for Antonio De Cumis
Bishop Antonio De Cumis (born , died ) Bishop of Catanzaro

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCatanzaro

  • a priest for 50.9 years
  • a bishop for 15.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,767
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,763, Number 3
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 155

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast