Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alexander MacDonald

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Highland District, Scotland

Titular Bishop of Polemonium


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1736¹BornBornish, South Uist
15 Jul 176428.5Ordained DeaconDeacon of Highland District, Scotland, Great Britain
10 Aug 176428.6Ordained PriestPriest of Highland District, Scotland, Great Britain
30 Sep 177943.7AppointedVicar Apostolic of Highland District, Scotland, Great Britain
30 Sep 177943.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Polemonium
12 Mar 178044.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Polemonium
9 Sep 179155.6DiedVicar Apostolic of Highland District, Scotland, Great Britain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Alexander MacDonald
Bishop Alexander MacDonald (born 1736, died ) Vicar Apostolic of Highland District

  • a priest for 27.0 years
  • a bishop for 11.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1780, Number 9
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 342, and Page 455
  • od/c01: CB, 17 Feb 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 18 Feb 2016