Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Battista Stella

Deceased

Bishop of Rimini


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Sep 1698BornBologna
8 Sep 174344.9Ordained DeaconDeacon
15 Sep 174344.9Ordained PriestPriest
19 Dec 175759.2AppointedBishop of Rimini, Italy
27 Dec 175759.2Ordained BishopBishop of Rimini, Italy
17 Dec 175860.2DiedBishop of Rimini, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Battista Stella:
Bishop Giovanni Battista Stella (born , died ) Bishop of Rimini

  • a priest for 15.2 years
  • a bishop for .9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 100

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015