Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Battista Coppola

Deceased

Bishop of Cassano all’Jonio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Aug 1710BornNapoli
24 Sep 173525.0Ordained PriestPriest
29 Nov 176353.2SelectedBishop of Cassano all’Jonio, Italy
19 Dec 176353.3ConfirmedBishop of Cassano all’Jonio, Italy
27 Dec 176353.3Ordained BishopBishop of Cassano all’Jonio, Italy
28 Aug 179786.9DiedBishop of Cassano all’Jonio, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Battista Coppola:
Bishop Giovanni Battista Coppola (born , died ) Bishop of Cassano all’Jonio

  • a priest for 61.9 years
  • a bishop for 33.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1795
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 152
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1763, Number 34

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 29 Nov 2015