Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giuseppe de Rossi

Deceased

Archbishop of Brindisi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Sep 1714BornNapoli
20 Dec 173824.2Ordained PriestPriest
9 Apr 176449.5AppointedArchbishop of Brindisi, Italy
15 Apr 176449.6Ordained BishopArchbishop of Brindisi, Italy
16 Feb 177863.4DiedArchbishop of Brindisi, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe de Rossi:
Archbishop Giuseppe de Rossi (born , died ) Archbishop of Brindisi

  • a priest for 39.2 years
  • a bishop for 13.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1775
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 132

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013