Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Domenico Volpe

Deceased

Bishop of Sant’Angelo dei Lombardi e Bisaccia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Sep 1708BornNapoli
10 Apr 173425.6Ordained PriestPriest
25 Jan 176253.4AppointedBishop of Sant’Angelo dei Lombardi e Bisaccia, Italy
31 Jan 176253.4Ordained BishopBishop of Sant’Angelo dei Lombardi e Bisaccia, Italy
12 Mar 178374.5DiedBishop of Sant’Angelo dei Lombardi e Bisaccia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Domenico Volpe:
Bishop Domenico Volpe (born , died ) Bishop of Sant’Angelo dei Lombardi e Bisaccia

  • a priest for 48.9 years
  • a bishop for 21.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1766
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013