Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Clemente Maria (Vincent) Bardini, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Acquapendente


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Mar 1718BornSan Cassiano
4 Mar 174224.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
18 Jul 176345.3AppointedBishop of Acquapendente, Italy
24 Jul 176345.3Ordained BishopBishop of Acquapendente, Italy
4 Jul 179072.3DiedBishop of Acquapendente, Italy

MicroData Summary for Clemente Maria (Vincent) Bardini:
Bishop Clemente Maria (Vincent) Bardini O.S.B. (born , died ) Bishop of Acquapendente

  • a priest for 48.3 years
  • a bishop for 26.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1779
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 92
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1763, Number 22

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 11 Dec 2015