Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pietro Domenico Scoppa

Deceased

Bishop of Gerace


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Nov 1720BornSquillace
21 Dec 174323.0Ordained PriestPriest
5 Apr 175635.3AppointedBishop of Gerace, Italy
18 Apr 175635.4Ordained BishopBishop of Gerace, Italy
14 Nov 179372.9DiedBishop of Gerace, Italy

MicroData Summary for Pietro Domenico Scoppa:
Bishop Pietro Domenico Scoppa (born , died ) Bishop of Gerace

  • a priest for 49.8 years
  • a bishop for 37.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1775
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 235
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1756, Number 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 18 Nov 2015