Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nicola Gagliardi

Deceased

Bishop of Alatri


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Sep 1708BornRoma
24 May 175546.6Ordained PriestPriest
11 May 176455.6AppointedBishop of Alatri, Italy
20 May 176455.6Ordained BishopBishop of Alatri, Italy
30 Jun 177768.7DiedBishop of Alatri, Italy

MicroData Summary for Nicola Gagliardi:
Bishop Nicola Gagliardi (born , died ) Bishop of Alatri

  • a priest for 22.0 years
  • a bishop for 13.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1775
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 72

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015