Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Paolo Carelli

Deceased

Bishop of Montepeloso


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Mar 1699³BornConversanen
Mar 1722³22.9Ordained PriestPriest
6 Apr 176162.0AppointedBishop of Montepeloso, Italy
19 Apr 176162.0Ordained BishopBishop of Montepeloso, Italy
14 Apr 176364.0DiedBishop of Montepeloso, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francesco Paolo Carelli:
Bishop Francesco Paolo Carelli (born , died ) Bishop of Montepeloso

  • a priest for 41.1 years
  • a bishop for 1.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 295

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015