Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Benedetto Latilla, C.R.L. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Avellino e Frigento

Titular Archbishop of Myra


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Jun 1710BornNapoli
14 Jun 173323.0Ordained PriestPriest of Canons Regular of the Congregation of the Most Holy Saviour of the Lateran
16 Dec 175444.5AppointedBishop of Avellino e Frigento, Italy
22 Dec 175444.5Ordained BishopBishop of Avellino e Frigento, Italy
29 Feb 176049.7ResignedBishop of Avellino e Frigento, Italy
21 Apr 176049.8AppointedTitular Archbishop of Myra
28 Dec 176757.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Avellino e Frigento, Italy

MicroData Summary for Benedetto Latilla:
Archbishop Benedetto Latilla C.R.L. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Avellino e Frigento

  • a priest for 34.5 years
  • a bishop for 13.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013