Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Pitocco

Deceased

Bishop of Trivento


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Oct 1721BornNapoli
29 Sep 174423.0Ordained PriestPriest
19 Jul 175634.8AppointedBishop of Trivento, Italy
25 Jul 175634.8Ordained BishopBishop of Trivento, Italy
30 May 177149.6DiedBishop of Trivento, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Pitocco:
Bishop Giuseppe Pitocco (born , died ) Bishop of Trivento

  • a priest for 26.7 years
  • a bishop for 14.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013