Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gaspare Barletta

Deceased

Bishop of Venosa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Apr 1716³BornGiojosa
30 May 174428.1Ordained PriestPriest
17 Dec 176448.6AppointedBishop of Venosa, Italy
21 Dec 176448.7Ordained BishopBishop of Venosa, Italy
1778¹61.7DiedBishop of Venosa, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gaspare Barletta:
Bishop Gaspare Barletta (born , died 1778) Bishop of Venosa

  • a priest for 33.5 years
  • a bishop for 13.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1770
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 437
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1764, Number 44

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 29 Nov 2015