Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Saint Louis

Archidioecesis Sancti Ludovici



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Robert James Carlson, Archbishop
  • Edward Matthew Rice, Auxiliary Bishop
  • Robert Joseph Hermann, Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 20 July 1847
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • State: Missouri
  • Country: United States of America
  • Square Kilometers: 15,451 (5,968 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: IX (IA, KS, MO, NE)
  • Catholic Directory Abbreviation: STL
  • Official Web Site: http://www.archstl.org/
  • Mailing Address: 20 Archbishop May Drive, Saint Louis, MO 63119
  • Telephone: (314)792-7000
  • Fax: 792-7842

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Saint Louis
18 July 1826ErectedDiocese of Durango
Diocese of Louisiana and the Two Floridas (Saint Louis of New Orleans)
Diocese of Saint Louis (erected)
28 July 1837Territory LostDiocese of Saint Louis Diocese of Dubuque (erected)
28 November 1843Territory LostDiocese of Saint Louis
Diocese of Vincennes
Diocese of Chicago (erected) (State of Illinois)
28 November 1843Territory LostDiocese of Saint Louis Diocese of Little Rock (erected)
1 December 1843Territory LostDiocese of Saint Louis Vicariate Apostolic of Oregon Territory (erected)
Archdiocese of Saint Louis
20 July 1847ElevatedDiocese of Saint Louis Archdiocese of Saint Louis
3 March 1868Territory LostArchdiocese of Saint Louis Diocese of Saint Joseph (erected)
10 September 1880Territory LostArchdiocese of Saint Louis Diocese of Kansas City (erected)
11 March 1883Territory LostArchdiocese of Saint Louis Vicariate Apostolic of Montana (Current part of the state of Montana East of the Rockies)
16 June 1911Territory LostArchdiocese of Saint Louis Diocese of Saint Joseph (Counties of Clark, Adair, Knox, Lewis, Macon, Shelby, Marion, Chariton, Randolph, Monroe, and Ralls)
2 July 1956Territory LostDiocese of Saint Joseph
Archdiocese of Saint Louis
Diocese of Springfield-Cape Girardeau (erected)
2 July 1956Territory LostDiocese of Saint Joseph
Archdiocese of Saint Louis
Diocese of Jefferson City (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Archdiocese of Saint Louis
1903220,000268174442497192ce
1911375,000314214528710234ce
1950433,4422,000,00021.7%5014799804425983,944331ap1951
1966512,1521,769,50028.9%5855201,1054639214,378259ap1967
1970531,2132,100,00025.3%2615518126548643,350249ap1971
1976514,6941,906,96827.0%5215081,0295009843,671246ap1977
1980531,1081,924,22027.6%5524811,033514308013,395246ap1981
1990541,7391,989,50027.2%5134169295831626772,867245ap1991
1999555,0002,064,54826.9%4714128836282131752,161227ap2000
2000555,0002,064,54826.9%4563638196772135602,120224ap2001
2001555,6212,089,00026.6%4653818466562255832,109228ap2002
2002555,7502,100,00026.5%4423357777152465242,023220ap2003
2003555,7502,118,72126.2%4373888256732465582,019217ap2004
2004555,7502,118,72126.2%4013577587332545341,913213ap2005
2008566,0002,177,00026.0%3743637377672485441,632189ap2009
2009572,0002,211,70725.9%3773397167982625541,429184ap2010
2010577,0002,232,37925.8%3673407078162755441,346184ap2011
2011582,0002,251,00025.9%3603176778592765081,323185ap2012

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_d, v3.0.1, 5 Oct 2014; Data: 8 Nov 2014