Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Joseph Leibrecht

Bishop Emeritus of Springfield-Cape Girardeau, Missouri


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Aug 1930 BornOverland
17 Mar 195625.6Ordained PriestPriest of Saint Louis, Missouri, USA
20 Oct 198454.2AppointedBishop of Springfield-Cape Girardeau, Missouri, USA
12 Dec 198454.3Ordained BishopBishop of Springfield-Cape Girardeau, Missouri, USA
24 Jan 200877.5RetiredBishop of Springfield-Cape Girardeau, Missouri, USA

MicroData Summary for John Joseph Leibrecht:
Bishop John Joseph Leibrecht (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Springfield-Cape Girardeau

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Springfield-Cape Girardeau.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 24 Jan 2008

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013