Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Chartrand

Deceased

Bishop of Indianapolis, Indiana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 May 1870BornSt. Louis, MO
24 Sep 189222.4Ordained PriestPriest
27 Jul 191040.2AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Indianapolis, Indiana, USA
27 Jul 191040.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Flavias
15 Sep 191040.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Flavias
7 Sep 191848.3SucceededBishop of Indianapolis, Indiana, USA
18 May 192555.0AppointedArchbishop of Cincinnati, Ohio, USA
3 Jul 192555.1ResignedArchbishop-Elect of Cincinnati, Ohio, USA
3 Jul 192555.1AppointedBishop of Indianapolis, Indiana, USA
8 Dec 193363.6DiedBishop of Indianapolis, Indiana, USA

Note(s): ⁸ Did Not Take Effect

MicroData Summary for Joseph Chartrand:
Bishop Joseph Chartrand (born , died ) Bishop of Indianapolis

  • a priest for 41.2 years
  • a bishop for 23.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1910, Number 67

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013