Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Thomas Francis Lillis

Deceased

Bishop of Kansas City, Missouri, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Mar 1861Born
15 Aug 188524.4Ordained PriestPriest of Kansas City, Missouri, USA
17 Sep 190443.5AppointedBishop of Leavenworth, Kansas, USA
27 Dec 190443.8Ordained BishopBishop of Leavenworth, Kansas, USA
22 Mar 191049.0AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Kansas City, Missouri, USA
22 Mar 191049.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Cibyra
21 Feb 191351.9SucceededBishop of Kansas City, Missouri, USA
29 Dec 193877.8DiedBishop of Kansas City, Missouri, USA

MicroData Summary for Thomas Francis Lillis
Bishop Thomas Francis Lillis (born , died ) Bishop of Kansas City

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLexington, MO

  • a priest for 53.3 years
  • a bishop for 34.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1904, Number 74

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018