Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Louisville

Archidioecesis Ludovicopolitana



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Joseph Edward Kurtz, Archbishop

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 10 December 1937
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • State: Kentucky
  • Country: United States of America
  • Square Kilometers: 21,041 (8,124 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: V (AL, KY, LA, MS, TN)
  • Catholic Directory Abbreviation: L
  • Official Web Site: http://www.archlou.org/
  • Mailing Address: 212 E. College St., P.O. Box 1073, Louisville, KY 40201
  • Telephone: (502)585-3291
  • Fax: 585-2466

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Bardstown
8 April 1808ErectedDiocese of Baltimore Diocese of Bardstown (erected)
19 June 1821Territory LostDiocese of Bardstown Diocese of Cincinnati (erected)
6 May 1834Territory LostDiocese of Bardstown Diocese of Vincennes (erected) (Indiana and the eastern portion of Illinois)
28 July 1837Territory LostDiocese of Bardstown Diocese of Nashville (erected) (State of Tennessee)
Diocese of Louisville
13 February 1841Name ChangedDiocese of Bardstown Diocese of Louisville
29 July 1853Territory LostDiocese of Louisville Diocese of Covington (erected)
9 December 1937Territory LostDiocese of Louisville Diocese of Owensboro (erected)
Archdiocese of Louisville
10 December 1937ElevatedDiocese of Louisville Archdiocese of Louisville
14 January 1988Territory LostDiocese of Covington
Archdiocese of Louisville
Diocese of Lexington (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Louisville
1910135,42114262204663ce
Archdiocese of Louisville
1950132,050905,07814.6%168133301438246420110ap1951
1965196,2711,097,10417.9%2801864664213771,526137ap1967
1970196,5371,097,10417.9%2591594184703031,482123ap1971
1976196,5051,223,70016.1%2551133685332611,542124ap1977
1980210,1541,320,00015.9%248110358587442321,462126ap1981
1990196,7341,156,00017.0%20673279705821671,281126ap1991
1999178,4201,139,02215.7%1855924473196831,026113ap2000
2000196,9291,206,28016.3%17664240820107152953112ap2001
2001196,9101,215,06916.2%17266238827108150987112ap2002
2002197,2831,220,07016.2%17065235839106146941111ap2003
2003197,2851,220,07016.2%17159230857111138944111ap2004
2004196,8881,119,46517.6%15958217907110137870111ap2005
2006210,0001,190,00017.6%144612051,024104133796112ap2007
2010218,0001,234,00017.7%136561921,135119117697102ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.1, 20 Jul 2013; data: 17 Aug 2013