Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Leo Christopher Byrne

Deceased

Coadjutor Archbishop of Saint Paul and Minneapolis, Minnesota, USA

Titular Archbishop of Plestia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Mar 1908Born
10 Jun 193325.2Ordained PriestPriest of Saint Louis, Missouri, USA
21 May 195446.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Saint Louis, Missouri, USA
21 May 195446.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Sabadia
29 Jun 195446.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sabadia
11 Feb 196152.8AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Wichita, Kansas, USA
25 Apr 196153.0InstalledCoadjutor Bishop of Wichita, Kansas, USA
31 Jul 196759.3AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Saint Paul and Minneapolis, Minnesota, USA
31 Jul 196759.3AppointedTitular Archbishop of Plestia
21 Oct 197466.5DiedCoadjutor Archbishop of Saint Paul and Minneapolis, Minnesota, USA

MicroData Summary for Leo Christopher Byrne
Archbishop Leo Christopher Byrne (born , died ) Coadjutor Archbishop of Saint Paul and Minneapolis

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSt. Louis

  • a priest for 41.3 years
  • a bishop for 20.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast