Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Paul Clarence Schulte

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Indianapolis, Indiana, USA

Titular Archbishop of Elicroca


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Mar 1890Born
11 Jun 191525.2Ordained PriestPriest
29 May 193747.1AppointedBishop of Leavenworth, Kansas, USA
21 Sep 193747.5Ordained BishopBishop of Leavenworth, Kansas, USA
20 Jul 194656.3AppointedArchbishop of Indianapolis, Indiana, USA
3 Jan 197079.7ResignedArchbishop of Indianapolis, Indiana, USA
3 Jan 197079.7AppointedTitular Archbishop of Elicroca
17 Feb 198493.9DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Indianapolis, Indiana, USA

MicroData Summary for Paul Clarence Schulte
Archbishop Paul Clarence Schulte (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Indianapolis

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFredericktown, MO
Ordained BishopSaint Louis, Archdiocese of Saint Louis, Missouri

  • a priest for 68.6 years
  • a bishop for 46.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1937, Number 54
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 11, Number 590

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast