Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Robert Joseph Hermann

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Saint Louis, Missouri

Titular Bishop of Zerta


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Aug 1934 BornWeingarten, MO
30 Mar 196328.6Ordained PriestPriest of Saint Louis, Missouri, USA
16 Oct 200268.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Saint Louis, Missouri, USA
16 Oct 200268.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Zerta
12 Dec 200268.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Zerta
1 Dec 201076.3RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Saint Louis, Missouri, USA

MicroData Summary for Robert Joseph Hermann:
Bishop Robert Joseph Hermann (born ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Saint Louis

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Saint Louis.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 1 Dec 2010
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 169, Number 14,290

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013