Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Edward Kenneth Braxton

Bishop Emeritus of Belleville, Illinois, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Jun 1944 Born
13 May 197025.8Ordained PriestPriest of Chicago, Illinois, USA
28 Mar 199550.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Saint Louis, Missouri, USA
28 Mar 199550.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Macomades Rusticiana
17 May 199550.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Macomades Rusticiana
12 Dec 200056.4AppointedBishop of Lake Charles, Louisiana, USA
22 Feb 200156.6InstalledBishop of Lake Charles, Louisiana, USA
15 Mar 200560.7AppointedBishop of Belleville, Illinois, USA
22 Jun 200560.9InstalledBishop of Belleville, Illinois, USA
3 Apr 202075.7RetiredBishop of Belleville, Illinois, USA

MicroData Summary for Edward Kenneth Braxton
Bishop Edward Kenneth Braxton (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Belleville

EventPlace
Birth PlaceChicago
Ordained BishopSaint Louis, Cathedral, Saint Louis, Archdiocese of Saint Louis, Missouri

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Belleville.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 142, Number 12,553
  • r: Bollettino, 3 Apr 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 18 May 2020

Quantcast