Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Adolph John Paschang, M.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Jiangmen [Kongmoon]


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Apr 1895BornMartinsburg, MO, USA
191721.7ProfessedMember of Catholic Foreign Mission Society of America
21 May 192126.0Ordained PriestPriest of Catholic Foreign Mission Society of America
17 Jun 193742.1AppointedVicar Apostolic of Kongmoon [Jiangmen], China
17 Jun 193742.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Sasima
30 Nov 193742.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sasima
11 Apr 194650.9AppointedBishop of Jiangmen [Kongmoon], China
3 Feb 196872.7DiedBishop of Jiangmen [Kongmoon], China

MicroData Summary for Adolph John Paschang:
Bishop Adolph John Paschang M.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Jiangmen [Kongmoon]

  • a priest for 46.7 years
  • a bishop for 30.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1937, Number 81

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015