Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop John Hennessy

Deceased

Archbishop of Dubuque, Iowa, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Aug 1825Born
1 Nov 185025.1Ordained PriestPriest of Saint Louis, Missouri, USA
24 Apr 186640.6AppointedBishop of Dubuque, Iowa, USA
30 Sep 186641.0Ordained BishopBishop of Dubuque, Iowa, USA
17 Jun 189367.8AppointedArchbishop of Dubuque, Iowa, USA
4 Mar 190074.5DiedArchbishop of Dubuque, Iowa, USA

MicroData Summary for John Hennessy
Archbishop John Hennessy (born , died ) Archbishop of Dubuque

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBulgaden, Diocese of Limerick, Ireland
Ordained BishopS. Raphael, Cathedral, Dubuque, Diocese of Dubuque, Iowa

  • a priest for 49.3 years
  • a bishop for 33.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 252
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1866, Number 30

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 19 Apr 2017