Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Leo John Steck

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Salt Lake City, Utah, USA

Titular Bishop of Ilium


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Aug 1898Born
8 Jun 192425.7Ordained PriestPriest
13 Mar 194849.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Salt Lake, Utah, USA
13 Mar 194849.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Ilium
20 May 194849.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ilium
19 Jun 195051.8DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Salt Lake, Utah, USA

MicroData Summary for Leo John Steck
Bishop Leo John Steck (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Salt Lake City

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSt. Louis, MO

  • a priest for 26.0 years
  • a bishop for 2.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1948, Number 47

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast