Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop James Terry Steib, S.V.D.

Bishop Emeritus of Memphis, Tennessee


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 May 1940 BornVacherie
6 Jan 196726.6Ordained PriestPriest of Society of the Divine Word
6 Dec 198343.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Saint Louis, Missouri, USA
6 Dec 198343.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Fallaba
10 Feb 198443.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Fallaba
24 Mar 199352.8AppointedBishop of Memphis, Tennessee, USA
23 Aug 201676.2RetiredBishop of Memphis, Tennessee, USA

MicroData Summary for James Terry Steib
Bishop James Terry Steib S.V.D. (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Memphis

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Memphis.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 23 Aug 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 23 Aug 2016