Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Alphonse McNicholas

Deceased

Bishop of Springfield in Illinois, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Jan 1923Born
7 Jun 194926.4Ordained PriestPriest of Saint Louis, Missouri, USA
31 Jan 196946.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Saint Louis, Missouri, USA
31 Jan 196946.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Scala
25 Mar 196946.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Scala
22 Jul 197552.5AppointedBishop of Springfield in Illinois, USA
17 Apr 198360.2DiedBishop of Springfield in Illinois, USA

MicroData Summary for Joseph Alphonse McNicholas
Bishop Joseph Alphonse McNicholas (born , died ) Bishop of Springfield in Illinois

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSt. Louis, Archdiocese of Saint Louis, Missouri
Ordained PriestSt. Louis, Archdiocese of Saint Louis, Missouri
Ordained BishopCathedral, St. Louis, Archdiocese of Saint Louis, Missouri

  • a priest for 33.8 years
  • a bishop for 14.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 152, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • c1: CB, 9 Feb 2018
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 7, Number 336

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast