Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop George Joseph Gottwald

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Saint Louis, Missouri

Titular Bishop of Cedamusa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 May 1914BornSt. Louis
9 Jun 194026.1Ordained PriestPriest of Saint Louis, Missouri, USA
23 Jun 196147.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Saint Louis, Missouri, USA
23 Jun 196147.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Cedamusa
8 Aug 196147.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cedamusa
2 Aug 198874.2ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Saint Louis, Missouri, USA
11 Mar 200287.8DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Saint Louis, Missouri, USA

MicroData Summary for George Joseph Gottwald:
Bishop George Joseph Gottwald (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Saint Louis

  • a priest for 61.8 years
  • a bishop for 40.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 169, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013