Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Thomas Bonacum

Deceased

Bishop of Lincoln, Nebraska, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Jan 1847Born
18 Jun 187023.3Ordained PriestPriest
9 Aug 188740.5AppointedBishop of Lincoln, Nebraska, USA
30 Nov 188740.8Ordained BishopBishop of Lincoln, Nebraska, USA
4 Feb 191164.0DiedBishop of Lincoln, Nebraska, USA

MicroData Summary for Thomas Bonacum (VIAF: 315695870)
Bishop Thomas Bonacum (born , died ) Bishop of Lincoln

EventPlace
Birth PlacePenane, Loughmore, Archdiocese of Cashel (-Emly), Ireland
Ordained BishopSt. John, St. Louis, Archdiocese of Saint Louis, Missouri

  • a priest for 40.6 years
  • a bishop for 23.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 345
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1887, Number 64

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 15 Jun 2017