Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Mark Steven Rivituso

Auxiliary Bishop of Saint Louis, Missouri, USA

Titular Bishop of Turuzi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Sep 1961 Born
16 Jan 198826.3Ordained PriestPriest of Saint Louis, Missouri, USA
7 Mar 201755.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Saint Louis, Missouri, USA
7 Mar 201755.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Turuzi
2 May 201755.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Turuzi

MicroData Summary for Mark Steven Rivituso
Bishop Mark Steven Rivituso (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Saint Louis

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaint Louis, Archdiocese of Saint Louis, Missouri
Ordained PriestCathedral, Saint Louis, Archdiocese of Saint Louis, Missouri
Ordained BishopCathedral, Saint Louis, Archdiocese of Saint Louis, Missouri

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Saint Louis.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 7 Mar 2017
  • c34: CB, 3 Apr 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 3 May 2017